Showing Collections: 1 - 7 of 7
Harold Brayman papers
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0261
Abstract
Harold Brayman (1900-1988), a political journalist and former director of the Public Relations Department of Du Pont Company for 21 years, helped establish a concept of public relations which was widely emulated throughout the United States. The Harold Brayman papers, spanning from 1900-1991, document the successful dual career of one man in the fields of journalism and public relations. The collection includes correspondence, memoranda, press releases, speeches, newspaper clippings and...
Dates:
1900-1991; Majority of material found within 1928-1978
Harold Brayman papers supplement
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0261s
Abstract
Harold Brayman (1900-1988), a political journalist and former director of the Public Relations Department of Du Pont Company for 21 years, helped establish a concept of public relations which was widely emulated throughout the United States. The Harold Brayman papers supplement, spanning from 1914-1992, contains substantial editions to the original collection, documenting Brayman's dual careers in the fields of journalism and public relations. The collection includes correspondence,...
Dates:
1914-1992
Thomas R. Carper congressional papers
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0399
Abstract
Thomas R. Carper (1947- ) served the state of Delaware as its member-at-large in the U.S. House of Representatives for five terms: he was elected as a Democrat to the Ninety-eighth and to the four succeeding Congresses (January 3, 1983 - January 3, 1993). Carper served on the committees of Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs, and Merchant Marine and Fisheries, with memberships on several subcommittees. Carper was elected with the "budget conscious class of 1982" and was a fiscal conservative...
Dates:
1979-1993; Majority of material found within 1982-1992
Bill Frank - John J. Williams research files
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0098-F0209
Abstract
Clippings, articles, press releases, photographs, and other ephemera concerning the career of U.S. Senator John J. Williams, apparently gathered by Delaware journalist Bill Frank.
Dates:
1949-1971
Edward E. "Ted" Kaufman papers
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0660
Abstract
Edward E. "Ted" Kaufman (b. 1939) represented Delaware in the United States Senate from January 15, 2009 - November 15, 2010. Democrat Ted Kaufman was appointed by Governor Ruth Ann Minner to fill the Senate vacancy caused by the resignation of newly elected Vice President Joseph R. Biden, Jr.; Senator Ted Kaufman did not seek election to the office in a special election for the seat in November 2010. The bulk of the Ted Kaufman papers documents the 22 months he spent in the United States...
Dates:
1994-2013; Majority of material found within 2009-2010
William Satterfield collection of Delaware political radio commercials and interviews
Collection
Identifier: MSS 0877
Abstract
William Satterfield, a native of Dover, Delaware, served as a news reporter and news director of WKEN (AM 1600) between 1975 and 1984. The William Satterfield collection of Delaware political radio commercials and interviews contains approximately 485 unique recordings, documenting the political discourse of the First State in the 1970s and 1980s.
Dates:
1970-1986; Majority of material found within 1972, 1980-1984
Willard Saulsbury, Jr., papers
Collection — Box: Duplicates
Identifier: MSS 0331
Abstract
Willard Saulsbury, Jr. (1861-1927), was a prominent Delaware lawyer and a member of a a leading Delaware political family, serving in the United States Senate from 1913-1919 as as President Pro Tempore of the Senate from 1916 to 1919. The bulk of the Willard Saulsbury, Jr., papers belong to Saulsbury himself, dating from 1908-1926 when Saulsbury was at his political and business peak. The collection, consisting of papers, photographs, maps, and political realia, also includes papers and...
Dates:
1716-1930; Majority of material found within 1908-1926